+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 2/27/2014
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 96, Nays 0
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 2/20/14
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
February 27, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 30
February 20, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 96
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor