+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/10/2020
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommended for concurrence by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/5/2020
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 1/15/20
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
February 10, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 9
February 5, 2020: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for concurrence by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 15, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 97
+ − Sponsors (84)
Type:
Primary Sponsor