+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 4/10/2014
- Rec. for concur by S. Comm ref to: S. Cal. Comm.
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/9/2014
- R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/9/14
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Recalled from S. Jud. Comm.
- Ref. to S. F,W&M Comm.
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Jud. Comm.
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Adopted, Ayes 90, Nays 0
- All added as Sponsors
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/17/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/13/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/5/2014
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (5)
April 10, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 30
April 9, 2014: S. FW&M COMM.
- Yeas: 10
March 17, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 90
March 13, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
March 5, 2014: CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (82)
Type:
Primary Sponsor