+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/7/2022
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Recommended for concurrence by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/2/2022
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 84, Nays 0, PNV 1
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 1/20/2022
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 14, 2022 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
February 7, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 9
February 2, 2022: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for concurrence by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 20, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 84
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor