+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/31/2014
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for concur by S. Comm ref to: S. Cal. Comm.
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. F,W&M Comm.
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Adopted, Ayes 96, Nays 0
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/10/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/6/2014
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/4/2014
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/26/2014
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 2/18/2014
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (7)
March 31, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 31
March 25, 2014: S. FW&M COMM.
- Yeas: 7
March 10, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 96
March 6, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
March 4, 2014: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE
February 26, 2014: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE
February 18, 2014: AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor