+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/8/2018
- Senate Reset on calendar for 2/8/2018
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 2/7/2018
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- All Ayes added as Sponsors
- Adopted, Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 1-29-18
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
February 8, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONCUR
- Yeas: 30
January 29, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 97
+ − Sponsors (79)
Type:
Primary Sponsor