+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. E,A&NR Comm.
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Adopted, Ayes 90, Nays 0
- All added as Sponsors
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/17/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/13/2014
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/11/2014
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (3)
March 17, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 90
March 13, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
March 11, 2014: AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (89)
Type:
Primary Sponsor