+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 5/1/2019
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 98, Nays 0, PNV 1
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 5/1/19
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
May 1, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 1
May 1, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 30
February 13, 2012: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 98
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor