+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 25, Nays 0
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/22/2018
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 3/22/2018
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/19/2018
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for concurrence by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/13/2018
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 3
- All Ayes added as Sponsors
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 1-24-18
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (3)
March 22, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur
- Yeas: 9
March 13, 2018: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for concurrence by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 24, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
+ − Sponsors (74)
Type:
Primary Sponsor