+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 2/6/2014
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 98, Nays 0
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 1/30/14
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
February 6, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 33
January 30, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 98
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor