+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 1/29/2018
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Adopted, Ayes 98, Nays 0, PNV 0
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 1/22/18
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
January 29, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
January 22, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 98
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor