+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 5/5/2021
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 5/4/21
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
May 5, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 31
May 4, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 90
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor