+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/4/2019
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Adopted, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 1/28/2019
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
February 4, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 29
January 28, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor