+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/30/2019
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/29/19
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
April 30, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 31
April 29, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
+ − Sponsors (78)
Type:
Primary Sponsor