+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 2/29/2016
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Adopted, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 2/22/18
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
February 29, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
February 22, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94