+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 28, Nays 0
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/30/2019
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 1
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/24/19
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
April 30, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 28
April 24, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor