+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/29/2019
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 90, Nays 1, PNV 2
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/23/19
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
April 29, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 32
April 23, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (79)
Type:
Primary Sponsor