+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 5/10/2017
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 2 for 5/9/2017
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
May 10, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 31
May 9, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 90
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor