+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- SJR 527 substituted
- Objected to on Consent Calendar.
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/10/2014
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/6/2014
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/4/2014
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., ref. to State Government Committee
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.