+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 5/4/2021
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 4/29/2021
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
May 4, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 32
April 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 89
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor