+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 4/8/2014
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Rec for concur by S. S&L Gov. Comm., ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/1/2014
- R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. S&L Govt. Comm.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. S&L Gov. Comm.
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- All added as Sponsors
- Adopted as am., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 1
- H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0763)
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/13/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/6/2014
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/4/2014
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/26/2014
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., ref. to State Government Committee
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0763
Amendment 1-0 to HJR0553
+ − Votes (6)
April 8, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 31
April 1, 2014: S. S&L GOVT. COMM.
- Yeas: 9
March 13, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 90
- Present/NV: 1
March 6, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
March 4, 2014: STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE
February 26, 2014: STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (83)
Type:
Primary Sponsor