+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 2/3/2016
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 1/28/16
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
February 3, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 33
January 28, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 90
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor