+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 1/22/2014
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 96, Nays 0
- All added as Sponsors
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 1/15/14
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
January 22, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 30
January 15, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 96
+ − Sponsors (88)
Type:
Primary Sponsor