+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 12, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 5/9/2017
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 5/5/17
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
May 9, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
May 5, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 87
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor