+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 2/3/2014
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Adopted, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 1
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- All added as Sponsors
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on H. consent cal. for 1/27/13
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Held on desk.
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 1/16/2014
- Objected to on Consent Calendar.
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 1/15/14
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
February 3, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 33
January 27, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (88)
Type:
Primary Sponsor