+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (32)
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 2/6/2014
- Rec. for concur by S. Comm ref to: S. Cal. Comm.
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/4/2014
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 2/4/2014
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 1/21/2014
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. S&L Gov. Comm.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0
- H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0512)
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/16/2013
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2013
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/16/2013
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/15/2013
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/11/2013
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2013
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/10/2013
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2013
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/10/2013
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2013
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/19/2013
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., ref. to State Government Committee
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0512
Amendment 1-0 to HJR0051
+ − Votes (7)
February 6, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
February 4, 2014: S. S&L GOVT. COMM.
- Yeas: 8
April 18, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 94
April 16, 2013: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
April 16, 2013: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE
April 15, 2013: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE
March 19, 2013: STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor