+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended, Concurred, voice vote
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., & Nat. Resources
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 2
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/18/19
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
April 18, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor