+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal. in Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2016
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/2/2016
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Intro., ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 2, 2016: BUSINESS AND UTILITIES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor