+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 28, Nays 0
On January 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 1/20/2016
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 1/13/16
On December 21, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
January 20, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 28
January 13, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor