+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 2/25/2021
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 2/10/2021
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
February 25, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 32
February 10, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor