+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
- Signed by Governor.
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 4 cal. for 4/18/2013
- Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 90, Nays 0
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. #2 for 4/17/13
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
April 18, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 33
April 17, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 90
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (87)
Type:
Primary Sponsor