+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 2/23/2015
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 94, Nays 0
- All Ayes added as Sponsors
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 2/11/15
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
February 23, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
February 11, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
+ − Sponsors (84)
Type:
Primary Sponsor