+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Adopted, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 2
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 3-4-19
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 4, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 2
April 9, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor