+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 4/18/2013
- Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 90, Nays 0
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/15/13
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
April 18, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
April 15, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 90
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor