+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/5/2021
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Adopted, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 3/29/21
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
April 5, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 32
March 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92