+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Adopted, Ayes 93, Nays 0
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/18/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2013
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/13/2013
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (3)
March 18, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 2
March 14, 2013: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
March 13, 2013: CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor