+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 19, Nays 6
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/5/2021
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 for 5/4/2021
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/15/2021
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/15/2021
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/12/2021
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Adopted, Ayes 71, Nays 20, PNV 0
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/5/21
- Objected to on Consent Calendar.
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 3/29/21
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
May 5, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 6
April 5, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 20
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor