+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/1/2021
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 1
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 3/25/21
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
April 1, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 32
March 25, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor