+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 2/6/2017
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Adopted, Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 2/1/17
On January 13, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
February 6, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
February 1, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91