+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 4/24/2017
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Adopted, Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 1
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/17/17
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
April 24, 2017: FLOOR VOTE:
- Yeas: 31
April 17, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 89
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor