+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 4/13/2015
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Adopted, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/6/15
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
April 13, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
April 6, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 96
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor