+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 4/15/2013
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. for concur by S. F,W&M Comm ref to: S. Cal. Comm.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2013
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. F,W&M Comm
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 96, Nays 0
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 3/27/13
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (3)
April 15, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
April 8, 2013: S. FW&M COMM.
- Yeas: 9
March 27, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 96
+ − Sponsors (92)
Type:
Primary Sponsor