+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/4/2019
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Adopted, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 1
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 2-25-19
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 4, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 31
February 25, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor