+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 3/22/2021
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Adopted, Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 1
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 3/15/21
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 22, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 32
March 15, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 88
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor