+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 4/1/2013
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 97, Nays 0
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 3/25/13
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
April 1, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 29
March 25, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 97
+ − Sponsors (91)
Type:
Primary Sponsor