+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- H. subst. & concurred in SJR 204
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3-14-19
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/7/2019
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education for 3/6/2019
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., ref. to Education
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
March 14, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 1