+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On January 13, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 1/12/2017
- Received from House, refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 1/11/17
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
January 12, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
January 11, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor