+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 3/15/2021
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Adopted, Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 4
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 3/8/2021
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 15, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 30
March 8, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor