+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended, Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 96, Nays 0
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/12/2015
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/11/2015
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 2/10/2015
On January 17, 2015 in the House:
- Ref. to Education Administration & Planning
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Intro.
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (4)
February 12, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 96
February 10, 2015: EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 10, 2015: EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 10, 2015: EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor