+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/29/2021
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for concurrence by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/24/2021
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Adopted, Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 4
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 3/8/2021
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
March 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 9
March 24, 2021: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for concurrence by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
March 8, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 4